EP4052599 - AEROSOL-PRODUCING DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen First Union Technology Co., Ltd. 1-3 F, Building C Gaoxin Industry Zone Tangwei Village Fuyong Town Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Shenhui Bldg C, Tangwei High-Tech Park, Fuyong Str, Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
XU, Zhongli Bldg C, Tangwei High-Tech Park, Fuyong Str, Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
LI, Yonghai Bldg C, Tangwei High-Tech Park, Fuyong Str, Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20880872.5 | 30.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020CN125358 | Priority number, date | CN20191156471 | 31.10.2019 Original published format: CN201911056471 | [2022/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021083344 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4052599 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/50, A24F40/465, H05B6/06, H05B6/10, // H05B6/12, H03B5/12 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
A24F40/50 (EP);
A24F40/465 (EP,US);
A24F40/51 (US);
A24F40/57 (EP,US);
H02M7/4815 (EP);
H02M7/4818 (EP,US);
H02M7/53803 (EP);
H02M7/539 (EP);
H03B5/1206 (EP);
H03B5/1228 (EP);
H05B6/06 (EP);
H05B6/108 (EP,US);
A24F40/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | A24F40/51, A24F40/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON AEROSOLEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG | [2022/36] | English: | AEROSOL-PRODUCING DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD | [2022/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'AÉROSOL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2022 | Translation filed | 29.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 06.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2018178114 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO INVESTMENTS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,10-12,14,15 * page 6, line 26 - page 15, line 32; figures 1,2a, 3a * * page 28, line 4 - line 16; figure 4 * [I] 4-9,13; | [A]WO2019122097 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO INVESTMENTS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15* page 11, line 19 - line 32; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US2019200677 (CHONG ALEXANDER CHINHAK [US], et al) [X] 15 * paragraph [0087]; figures 2a,2b9c * [I] 1-14 |