Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.02.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
16.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
16.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
24.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
20.01.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
20.01.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
03.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.11.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.08.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
26.08.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
01.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.06.2022 | Change - representative | |
15.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.05.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |