Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023192846 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962936900 | 18.11.2019 | US202017777591 | 18.11.2020 | WO2020US61130 | 18.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220113951 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962936900 | 18.11.2019 | WO2020US61130 | 18.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023502108 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962936900 | 18.11.2019 | WO2020US61130 | 18.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL293026 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962936900 | 18.11.2019 | WO2020US61130 | 18.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116018353 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962936900 | 18.11.2019 | WO2020US61130 | 18.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3161617 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962936900 | 18.11.2019 | WO2020US61130 | 18.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020388577 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962936900 | 18.11.2019 | WO2020US61130 | 18.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4061848 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | A4 | EP4061848 | 28.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962936900 | 18.11.2019 | WO2020US61130 | 18.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022009611 | 09.08.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201962936900 | 18.11.2019 | WO2020US61130 | 18.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022005949 | 02.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962936900 | 18.11.2019 | WO2020US61130 | 18.11.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021102055 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962936900 | 18.11.2019 |