EP4061848 - ANTI-ROR-2 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street Twelfth Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIPPS, Thomas J. 13175 Caminito Mendiola San Diego, California 92130 / US | 02 /
WIDHOPF, George F., II 5911 Seacrest View Road San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20889747.0 | 18.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020US61130 | Priority number, date | US201962936900P | 18.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962936900 P | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021102055 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061848 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K19/00, A61P35/00 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/4613 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/4631 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/464411 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/6849 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/57484 (KR);
G01N33/57492 (US);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
A61K2239/50 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/34 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/524 (US);
C07K2317/526 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/77 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | ANTI-ROR-2-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2022/39] | English: | ANTI-ROR-2 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE | [2022/39] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-ROR-2 ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2019016392 (NBE THERAPEUTICS AG [CH]) [X] 1,13-15 * Page 1, paragraph 1, page 2, paragraph 2, last paragraph of page 32 - page 33 Pages 57, 58 *[I] 2-12 | International search | [A]WO2008031009 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1* pg 19 para 4 - pg 20 para 1, pg 20 para 2, SEQ ID NO: 17 *; | [A]WO2016166297 (VAN BERKEL PATRICIUS HENDRIKUS CORNELIS [CH], et al) [A] 1-10, 12-13, 73, 77, 81-84 * Claim 130, SEQ ID NO: 1 *; | [A]WO2017197234 (BIOATLA LLC [US]) [A] 1-10, 12-13, 73, 77, 81- 84 * para [0064]-[0065], [0073],[0088], [0252], [0258], [0261], [0291], Abstract *; | [A]WO2017218707 (XENCOR INC [US]) [A] 1-10, 12-13, 73, 77, 81-84 * para [00171], SEQ ID NO: 9826 *; | [A]US2019031754 (RADER CHRISTOPH [US], et al) [A] 77, 81-84 * para [0010], [0019]-[0020], [0042], [0067], [0106], Abstract * |