EP4074806 - DUST SUPPRESSING AGENT AND DUST SUPPRESSING METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | For all designated states Misan E&C 1223, 233-1 Mokdongdong-ro Yangcheon-gu Seoul 07995 / KR | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Weonhui c/o POSCO, (Goedong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam- gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 02 /
RHEE, Qhwang-Hee 201-306, 81, Sinsu-ro, Mapo-gu Seoul 04098 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Ki-Hang c/o POSCO, (Goedong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam- gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Seong-Moon c/o POSCO, (Goedong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam- gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/42] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20899647.0 | 10.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020KR18056 | Priority number, date | KR20190164619 | 11.12.2019 Original published format: KR 20190164619 | [2022/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021118258 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074806 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/22, E21F5/12 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
C09K3/22 (EP,KR);
E21F5/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | C09K3/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | STAUBUNTERDRÜCKUNGSMITTEL UND STAUBUNTERDRÜCKUNGSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN | [2022/42] | English: | DUST SUPPRESSING AGENT AND DUST SUPPRESSING METHOD USING SAME | [2022/42] | French: | AGENT DE SUPPRESSION DE POUSSIÈRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SUPPRESSION DE POUSSIÈRE L'UTILISANT | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2022 | Translation filed | 06.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 29.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005085407 (OLDENHOVE LOUIS [BE], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [XA]US2008182756 (KOZUKI YUMIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * claims 1-5 * [A] 3,6,7 | International search | [A]JPH01118589 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [A] 1-7* See pages 701 and 702. *; | [A]US5409626 (MUTH STEVEN A [US]) [A] 2; | [Y]US2004065198 (WOLFF ANDREW R [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-7 * See claims 31-35. *; | [A]KR101520050B (KANG NAM [KR]) [A] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0050]-[0058]; and claims 1, 3 and 4. *; | [A]KR20190120224 (STATE ATOMIC ENERGY CORP ROSATOM BEHALF RUSSIAN FEDERATION [RU]) [A] 1-7 * See paragraph [0042]; and claim 1. * |