EP4077215 - INTEGRATED PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING BIS(FLUOROSULFONYL) IMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LULY, Matthew, H. Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 02 /
POINTER, Bernard, E. Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 03 /
LEONE, Brian Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Stepney, Gregory John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20900951.3 | 15.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020US65102 | Priority number, date | US201962949105P | 17.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962949105 P | US202017117284 | 10.12.2020 Original published format: US202017117284 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021126840 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4077215 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C01B21/093, C01B21/086, H01M10/052, B01D3/14 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
C01B21/093 (EP,KR,US);
C01B21/086 (KR);
B01D3/14 (US);
B01D3/143 (EP,KR);
B01J19/0013 (KR,US);
B01J19/18 (KR);
B01J19/24 (KR);
B01J3/04 (KR);
B01D2202/00 (KR,US);
B01J2219/00031 (KR,US);
B01J2219/00033 (KR,US);
B01J2219/00049 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00051 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00074 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00076 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00083 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00087 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00094 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/43] | C01B21/093, C01B21/086, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIS(FLUORSULFONYL)IMID | [2022/43] | English: | INTEGRATED PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING BIS(FLUOROSULFONYL) IMIDE | [2022/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉS INTÉGRÉS DE PRODUCTION DE BIS(FLUOROSULFONYL)IMIDE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2011111780 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]US8337797 (HONDA TSUNETOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP2415709 (MITSUBISHI MAT ELECTRONIC CHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]US2017183230 (POSHUSTA JOSEPH CARL [US], et al) | International search | [A]WO2011111780 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al); | [A]EP2415709 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al); | [DY]US8337797 (HONDA TSUNETOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP2578567 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]US2017183230 (POSHUSTA JOSEPH CARL [US], et al) |