Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.02.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
23.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
28.04.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
28.04.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
14.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.12.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
02.12.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
07.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.08.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.08.2022 | Change - representative | |
24.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.09.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |