Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023149596 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200022652 | 25.02.2020 | WO2020KR02840 | 27.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4112059 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2024 | A4 | EP4112059 | 04.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200022652 | 25.02.2020 | WO2020KR02840 | 27.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021172624 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200022652 | 25.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102438006B | Global Dossier | 30.08.2022 | B1 | KR20210108010 | 02.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200022652 | 25.02.2020 |