EP4246491 - NAVIGATION METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Fang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Jinbo Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LENG, Jinan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHONG, Nan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 20962939.3 | 27.11.2020 | [2023/38] | WO2020CN132390 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022110049 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4246491 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/14, G08G1/00, G08G1/005, G08G1/04, G08G1/16, B62D15/02, G01C21/20, // G06V20/52 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
G08G1/144 (EP,CN);
G01C21/3685 (EP,US);
B62D15/0285 (EP);
G01C21/3407 (EP);
G06V20/58 (US);
G08G1/005 (EP);
G08G1/0112 (EP);
G08G1/04 (EP);
G08G1/142 (EP);
G08G1/143 (EP,US);
G08G1/146 (EP);
G08G1/148 (CN);
G08G1/149 (EP,CN);
G08G1/165 (EP);
G08G1/205 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | G08G1/14, G01C21/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | NAVIGATIONSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2023/38] | English: | NAVIGATION METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM | [2023/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2023 | Translation filed | 13.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 17.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012188100 (MIN KYOUNG-WOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2013010103 (IHARA NOBORU [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0081] *; | [A]US2017263124 (LI WENBO [CN]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0075] *; | [XAY]US2018301031 (NAAMANI ASAF [IL], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,11-14 * Paragraphs 48-51, 56-57, 69-71, 80-81, 111, 117-118, 121, 126, 135, 141;; figures 1, 2 * [A] 2,4,7,8 [Y] 10; | [XAY]CN109410623 (ZHEJIANG UNIVIEW TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-4,11-14 * Paragraphs 68-71, 76-93, 99, 105 * [A] 5,6,9,10 [Y] 7,8; | [Y]US2020207338 (CHO HOON KYUNG [KR]) [Y] 7,8 * Paragraphs 26, 91, 99-100, 103, 105, 108, 124-127 *; | [A]WO2020151632 (GREAT WALL MOTOR CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * |