EP3885182 - POWER CALCULATION APPARATUS AND POWER CALCULATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, IT | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKURAI, Takayuki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
KANAZAWA, Hiroyuki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
KUDO, Jun c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
OTOGASAKO, Ayano c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
PONTEFRACT, Thomas Stephen c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/39] | Feller, Frank Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21164605.4 | 24.03.2021 | [2021/39] | Priority number, date | JP20200058021 | 27.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020058021 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3885182 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3885182 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60L55/00, H02J3/32, G06Q50/06, G06Q50/30, B60L58/12, G06Q10/04, G06Q90/00, H02J3/38, G06Q10/06, H02J3/00 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
B60L55/00 (EP,US);
B60L53/18 (US);
B60L53/665 (US);
B60L58/12 (EP);
B60L58/13 (US);
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0631 (EP);
G06Q30/06 (US);
G06Q40/04 (US);
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
G06Q50/40 (EP);
H02J13/00028 (US);
H02J3/004 (EP);
H02J3/322 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (US);
H02J7/0063 (US);
B60L2240/622 (EP,US);
B60L2260/50 (EP);
B60L2260/54 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/39] | B60L55/00, H02J3/32, G06Q50/06, B60L58/12, G06Q10/04, G06Q90/00, H02J3/38, G06Q10/06, H02J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSBERECHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND LEISTUNGSBERECHNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/39] | English: | POWER CALCULATION APPARATUS AND POWER CALCULATION METHOD | [2021/39] | French: | APPAREIL DE CALCUL DE PUISSANCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CALCUL DE PUISSANCE | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | ES | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | IT | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | IE | 24.03.2023 | LU | 24.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | FR | 15.05.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
IE | 24.03.2023 | ||
LU | 24.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
IE | 24.03.2023 | ||
LU | 24.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
LU | 24.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 15.03.2023 | |
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2008052145 (KAPLAN DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,10 * abstract * * page 2 - page 13 * [A] 4 [Y] 7,8; | [Y]US2011202192 (KEMPTON WILLETT [US]) [Y] 7 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0186] *; | [X]US2012249068 (ISHIDA TAKAHARU [JP]) [X] 1,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0069] *; | [A]US2013204471 (O'CONNELL BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]DE112014002012T (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 8 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0230] * | by applicant | WO2015019585 |