Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.04.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] |
27.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.09.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
17.09.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
03.04.2021 | Change - representative |