Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11780436 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2023 | B2 | US2021316723 | 14.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020071587 | 13.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210127088 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020071587 | 13.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7327257B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2023 | B2 | JP2021168065 | 21.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020071587 | 13.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113538966B | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B | CN113538966 | 22.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020071587 | 13.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3896485 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020071587 | 13.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102021006989 | 26.10.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2020071587 | 13.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2763800 | 11.01.2022 | C1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020071587 | 13.04.2020 |