Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.06.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
08.02.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.02.2023 | First examination report | |
24.08.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
25.08.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.07.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
23.07.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
21.04.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.04.2021 | Change - representative |