Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3442134 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2021 | B1 | EP3442134 | 13.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83710106 | 11.08.2006 | EP07015912 | 13.08.2007 | EP17196441 | 13.08.2007 | US77905207 | 17.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3288190 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B1 | EP3288190 | 28.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83710106 | 11.08.2006 | EP07015912 | 13.08.2007 | US77905207 | 17.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3869706 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83710106 | 11.08.2006 | EP18198257 | 13.08.2007 | EP07015912 | 13.08.2007 | EP17196441 | 13.08.2007 | US77905207 | 17.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008018780 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83710106 | 11.08.2006 | US77905207 | 17.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7865153 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2011 | B2 | US2008039030 | 14.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83710106 | 11.08.2006 | US77905207 | 17.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101423763B | Global Dossier | 25.07.2014 | B1 | KR20080014713 | 14.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US83710106 | 11.08.2006 | US77905207 | 17.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1887713 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2017 | B1 | EP1887713 | 06.11.2013 | A3 | EP1887713 | 13.02.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US83710106 | 11.08.2006 | US77905207 | 17.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2655508T | 20.02.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US83710106 | 11.08.2006 | US77905207 | 17.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2878265T | 18.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US83710106 | 11.08.2006 | US77905207 | 17.07.2007 | Type | Earlier application | EP1887713 | EP3288190 | EP3442134 |