EP3869706 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMIT DIVERSITY AND BEAMFORMING IN A WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAHN, Farooq Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
VAN RENSBURG, Cornelius Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
TSAI, Jiann-An Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 21169173.8 | 13.08.2007 | [2021/34] | Priority number, date | US20060837101P | 11.08.2006 Original published format: US 837101 P | US20070779052 | 17.07.2007 Original published format: US 779052 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3869706 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
H04B7/0689 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0619 (KR);
H04B7/0671 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR SENDEDIVERSITÄT UND STRAHLFORMUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERK | [2021/34] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMIT DIVERSITY AND BEAMFORMING IN A WIRELESS NETWORK | [2021/34] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE DIVERSITÉ ET FORMATION DE FAISCEAUX DANS UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 09.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07015912.4 / EP1887713 | EP17196441.4 / EP3288190 | EP18198257.0 / EP3442134 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003223391 (MALAENDER LAURENCE EUGENE [US], et al); | [X]US2005286650 (HAN JIN-KYU [KR], et al); | [A]US7050832 (KASAPI ATHANASIOS AGAMAMNON [US]) | by applicant | US20060327799 |