EP3904919 - OPTICAL FILTERS AND IMAGE SENSORS AND CAMERA MODULES AND ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | For all designated states Industry University Cooperation Foundation of Korea Aerospace University 76 Hanggongdaehak-ro Deokyang-gu Goyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 10540 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | ||
For all designated states Industry University Cooperation Foundation of Korea Aerospace University 76 Hanggongdaehak-ro Deokyang-gu Goyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 10540 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Mi Jeong Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
HWANG, Jinyoung Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
CHO, Chung Kun Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
KIM, Hye Ran Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2021/44] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 21170214.7 | 23.04.2021 | [2021/44] | Priority number, date | KR20200052768 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200052768 | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3904919 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/00, G02B5/20, G02B5/28, H01L27/146, H04N5/225, B82Y20/00, G02B5/00 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
G02B5/281 (EP);
G02B5/208 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14621 (EP,CN);
G02B1/002 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/008 (EP);
G02B5/223 (KR);
H01L27/1462 (EP);
H01L27/14625 (CN,KR,US);
H04N23/55 (KR);
H04N25/772 (CN);
H04N3/14 (CN);
B82Y20/00 (EP);
G02B2207/101 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FILTER UND BILDSENSOREN UND KAMERAMODULE UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/44] | English: | OPTICAL FILTERS AND IMAGE SENSORS AND CAMERA MODULES AND ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2021/44] | French: | FILTRES OPTIQUES ET CAPTEURS D'IMAGE ET MODULES DE CAMÉRA ET DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2021/44] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 08.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013258456 (HASHIMURA AKINORI [US], et al); | [A]US2017146708 (LAH WOO JOO [KR]); | [A]US2017315270 (YASUDA HIDEKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2018166592 (TSENG HSIN-HSIANG [TW], et al) |