30.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
08.08.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
22.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
01.09.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
29.08.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
29.08.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.08.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.07.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
16.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
16.06.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
16.06.2023 |
Change - English title |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
16.06.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
27.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
30.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.03.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
25.03.2022 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
24.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.02.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.08.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
08.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2021 |
Change - representative |
|