Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3882091 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2023 | B1 | EP3882091 | 22.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615395249 | 30.12.2016 | EP17210457 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10017169 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2018 | B1 | US2018186355 | 05.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615395249 | 30.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3342654 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2021 | B1 | EP3342654 | 04.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615395249 | 30.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108263213B | Global Dossier | 04.06.2021 | B | CN108263213 | 10.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615395249 | 30.12.2016 | Type | Earlier application | EP3342654 |