Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021409284 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916728335 | 27.12.2019 | US202117471857 | 10.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11665776 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2023 | B2 | US2021204360 | 01.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916728335 | 27.12.2019 | US202016872096 | 11.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11657203 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2023 | B2 | US2021200928 | 01.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916728335 | 27.12.2019 | US202017116344 | 09.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11558259 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2023 | B2 | US2021203557 | 01.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916728335 | 27.12.2019 | US202017002186 | 25.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11121933 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2021 | B2 | US2021203564 | 01.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916728335 | 27.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230170609 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210059163 | 07.05.2021 | US202016872096 | 11.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4013014 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017116344 | 09.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3961472 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2022 | A3 | EP3961472 | 02.03.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US202017002186 | 25.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3842987 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916728335 | 27.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114625692 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202017116344 | 09.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114189450 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202017002186 | 25.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113055219B | Global Dossier | 03.03.2023 | B | CN113055219 | 29.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201916728335 | 27.12.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102594944B | Global Dossier | 26.10.2023 | B1 | KR20210137919 | 18.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US202016872096 | 11.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021180484 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US202016872096 | 11.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113642275B | Global Dossier | 02.08.2024 | B | CN113642275 | 12.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US202016872096 | 11.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3910522 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016872096 | 11.05.2020 |