EP3913497 - DATA IMPRINT TECHNIQUES FOR USE WITH DATA RETRIEVAL METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP SE Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLAVITCH, Noah 69190 Walldorf / DE | 02 /
SHERKAT, Reza 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 21173213.6 | 11.05.2021 | [2021/47] | Priority number, date | US202016880730 | 21.05.2020 Original published format: US202016880730 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913497 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3913497 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/28, G06F16/22 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G06F16/285 (EP);
G06F16/24552 (CN);
G06F16/24554 (US);
G06F16/221 (EP);
G06F16/2237 (EP,US);
G06F16/24 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] |
Former [2021/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DATENABDRUCKTECHNIKEN ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT DATENABRUFVERFAHREN | [2021/47] | English: | DATA IMPRINT TECHNIQUES FOR USE WITH DATA RETRIEVAL METHODS | [2021/47] | French: | TECHNIQUES D'IMPRESSION DE DONNÉES DESTINÉES À ÊTRE UTILISÉES AVEC DES PROCÉDÉS DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE DONNÉES | [2021/47] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 28.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 27.06.2024 |