Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3922655
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.05.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2024 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
09.01.2024 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
08.01.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.01.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
31.10.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.07.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.04.2023 |
First examination report |
|
17.06.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.06.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
17.06.2022 |
Change - designated states |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
14.06.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
09.11.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.07.2021 |
Change - representative |
|