Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012152731 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US201161556458 | 07.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024117117 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US202016867526 | 05.05.2020 | US201615332257 | 24.10.2016 | US201414272556 | 08.05.2014 | US201815911411 | 05.03.2018 | US202318377811 | 08.10.2023 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | US202117366252 | 02.07.2021 | US201213696439 | 06.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017037187 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US201414272556 | 08.05.2014 | US201615332257 | 24.10.2016 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | US201213696439 | 06.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9505883 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2016 | B2 | US2014323618 | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US201414272556 | 08.05.2014 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | US201213696439 | 06.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014186635 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US201161556458 | 07.11.2011 | US201214116048 | 06.05.2012 | WO2012EP58322 | 06.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013059075 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | US201113696439 | 07.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11814481 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2023 | B2 | US2021403645 | 30.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US202016867526 | 05.05.2020 | US201615332257 | 24.10.2016 | US201414272556 | 08.05.2014 | US201815911411 | 05.03.2018 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | US202117366252 | 02.07.2021 | US201213696439 | 06.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11078332 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2021 | B2 | US2020332060 | 22.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US202016867526 | 05.05.2020 | US201615332257 | 24.10.2016 | US201414272556 | 08.05.2014 | US201815911411 | 05.03.2018 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | US201213696439 | 06.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10767050 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2020 | B2 | US2018142099 | 24.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US201161556458 | 07.11.2011 | US201214116048 | 06.05.2012 | US201715822102 | 24.11.2017 | WO2012EP58322 | 06.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10738160 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2020 | B2 | US2018265633 | 20.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US201414272556 | 08.05.2014 | US201615332257 | 24.10.2016 | US201815911411 | 05.03.2018 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | US201213696439 | 06.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102023264B | Global Dossier | 04.11.2019 | B1 | KR20170119734 | 27.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101837215B | Global Dossier | 09.03.2018 | B1 | KR20130092960 | 21.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6223823B | Global Dossier | 01.11.2017 | B2 | JP2013531082 | 01.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2707405 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2021 | B1 | EP2707405 | 19.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US201161556458 | 07.11.2011 | EP12718259 | 06.05.2012 | WO2012EP58322 | 06.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2566904 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2021 | B1 | EP2566904 | 13.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105176460B | Global Dossier | 06.02.2018 | B | CN105176460 | 23.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | CN201180022853 | 07.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103025778B | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | B | CN103025778 | 03.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2834816 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2020 | C | CA2834816 | 15.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US201161556458 | 07.11.2011 | WO2012EP58322 | 06.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2797147 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2017 | C | CA2797147 | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011249759B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2014 | B2 | AU2011249759 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3922655 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | EP11720076 | 07.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012028525 | 08.12.2020 | B1 | BR112012028525 | 19.07.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE212011100094U | 11.01.2013 | U1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA025773 | 30.01.2017 | B1 | EA201291190 | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2882129T | 01.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2566904T | 25.10.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX339814 | 02.06.2016 | B | MX2012012633 | 20.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2566904T | 06.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP57363 | 07.05.2011 | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | EP11720076 | 07.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011138458 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7083368B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2022 | B2 | JP2020121560 | 13.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017201043 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6312337B | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | B2 | JP2016104885 | 09.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2012003123 | 05.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE055950T | 28.01.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY160858 | 31.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2566904T | 30.08.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US33245810 | 07.05.2010 | Type | Earlier application | EP2566904 |