EP3922655 - CARBOHYDRATE POLYAMINE BINDERS AND MATERIALS MADE THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Insulation Rue de Maestricht 95 4600 Visé / BE | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMPSON, Carl 1435 Mont Saint Guibert / BE | 02 /
APPLEY, Charles 1435 Mont Saint Guibert / BE | 03 /
MUELLER, Gert 1435 Mont Saint Guibert / BE | 04 /
PACOREL, Bénédicte 1435 Mont Saint Guibert / BE | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | ARC-IP ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 21184437.8 | 07.05.2011 | [2021/50] | Priority number, date | US201033245810P | 07.05.2010 Original published format: US 33245810 P | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922655 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G12/00, C08G14/00, C08G16/00 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
C08G12/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F251/00 (KR);
C08G73/02 (KR,US);
C08G14/00 (EP,US);
C08G16/00 (EP,US);
C08G83/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] |
Former [2021/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOHLENHYDRATPOLYAMINBINDER UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE MATERIALIEN | [2021/50] | English: | CARBOHYDRATE POLYAMINE BINDERS AND MATERIALS MADE THEREWITH | [2021/50] | French: | LIANTS À BASE DE GLUCIDES ET DE POLYAMINE ET MATIÈRES RÉALISÉES AVEC CES LIANTS | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 15.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11720076.6 / EP2566904 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1801053 (MEIGS JOSEPH V) [X] 1-13* page 1, line 4 - page 10, line 29; example -; claims 1-17 *; | [X]US2198874 (LEIGHTON HOLMES ERIC) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 58; example -; claims 1-17 *; | [X]US2392105 (SIDNEY SUSSMAN) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 1 - page 3; example -; claims 1-14 *; | [X]US2442989 (SIDNEY SUSSMAN) [X] 1-13 * column 1 - column 4, line 75; example -; claims 1-13 *; | [X]US2518956 (SIDNEY SUSSMAN) [X] 1-13 * column 1 - column 4, line 54; example -; claims 1-22 *; | [X]GB1391172 (GIVAUDAN & CIE SA) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 89; example -; claims 1-25 *; | [X]US4085076 (GIBBONS JOHN P, et al) [X] 1-13 * column 1, line 8 - column 6, line 5; example -; claims 1-12 *; | [X]GB1512066 (GIVAUDAN & CIE SA) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 9 - page 3, line 11; example -; claims 1-18 *; | [X]US4184986 (BOENIGER REGULA [CH], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 1, line 27 - column 3, line 65; example -; claim 1 *; | [X]US4186053 (BOENIGER REGULA [CH], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 1, line 11 - column 3, line 57; example -; claim 1 *; | [X]US4201857 (BOENIGER REGULA [CH], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 1 - column 3, line 68; example -; claims 1-2 *; | [X]CA1090026 (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC) [X] 1-13 * page 1 - page 9, line 5; example -; claims 1-38 *; | [X]GB2047258 (MAGYAR TUDOMANYOS AKADEMIA) [X] 1-13 * page 1 - page 3, line 104; example -; claims 1-13 *; | [X]DE4308089 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * column 1 - column 2, line 27; example -; claims 1-6 * | by applicant | US6638882 | US2005202224 | US2007027283 | WO2008089847 | WO2008089851 | WO2009019235 | - HODGE, J.E, "Chemistry of Browning Reactions in Model Systems", J. Agric. Food Chem., (19530000), vol. 1, doi:10.1021/jf60015a004, pages 928 - 943, XP009140802 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf60015a004 |