Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.05.2024 | First examination report | |
09.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
12.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
19.08.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
19.08.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
19.08.2022 | Change - designated states | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
16.05.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.01.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
20.07.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.07.2021 | Change - representative |