Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9714285 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2017 | B2 | US2015322146 | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | US201314038436 | 26.09.2013 | US201514808666 | 24.07.2015 | US201213486983 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9145458 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2015 | B2 | US2014023644 | 23.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | US201314038436 | 26.09.2013 | US201213486983 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8569462 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2013 | B2 | US2012315282 | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | US201213486983 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12071475 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2024 | B2 | US2021355204 | 18.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | US201916435022 | 07.06.2019 | US201314038436 | 26.09.2013 | US202117376933 | 15.07.2021 | US201514808666 | 24.07.2015 | US201715622955 | 14.06.2017 | US201213486983 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11098111 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2021 | B2 | US2019315850 | 17.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | US201916435022 | 07.06.2019 | US201314038436 | 26.09.2013 | US201514808666 | 24.07.2015 | US201715622955 | 14.06.2017 | US201213486983 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10358486 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2019 | B2 | US2018057578 | 01.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | US201314038436 | 26.09.2013 | US201514808666 | 24.07.2015 | US201715622955 | 14.06.2017 | US201213486983 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102577578B | Global Dossier | 11.09.2023 | B1 | KR20220063297 | 17.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20207024212 | 01.06.2012 | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102395736B | Global Dossier | 06.05.2022 | B1 | KR20200102547 | 31.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | KR20197034936 | 01.06.2012 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102148982B | Global Dossier | 27.08.2020 | B1 | KR20190134826 | 04.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102051014B | Global Dossier | 04.12.2019 | B1 | KR20140041672 | 04.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023015300 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021074575 | 27.04.2021 | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7179903B | Global Dossier | 29.11.2022 | B2 | JP2021112204 | 05.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | JP2019146320 | 08.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6363948B | Global Dossier | 25.07.2018 | B2 | JP2014518064 | 28.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL274595 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2023 | B2 | IL274595 | 30.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL229638 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2021 | B | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2714735 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2021 | B1 | EP2714735 | 31.12.2014 | A4 | EP2714735 | 09.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116333113 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | CN201280037239 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108424451B | Global Dossier | 09.09.2022 | B | CN108424451 | 21.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | CN201280037239 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103732623B | Global Dossier | 29.09.2017 | B | CN103732623 | 16.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2837556 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2022 | C | CA2837556 | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021215206 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2017203482 | 24.05.2017 | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | AU2019204781 | 03.07.2019 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | AU2021215206 | 12.08.2021 | AU2012261933 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019204781B | Global Dossier | 08.07.2021 | B2 | AU2019204781 | 25.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2017203482 | 24.05.2017 | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | AU2019204781 | 03.07.2019 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | AU2012261933 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017203482B | Global Dossier | 04.04.2019 | B2 | AU2017203482 | 15.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2017203482 | 24.05.2017 | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | AU2012261933 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012261933B | Global Dossier | 15.06.2017 | B2 | AU2012261933 | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3954704 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | EP12792320 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013030958 | 08.02.2022 | B1 | BR112013030958 | 22.11.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1124610T | 22.07.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2714735T | 18.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA032790 | 31.07.2019 | B1 | EA201391777 | 31.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2894398T | 14.02.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20211582T | 07.01.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | EP12792320 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2714735T | 10.12.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX351600 | 20.10.2017 | B | MX2013014210 | 03.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ618757 | 24.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ717933 | 26.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ61875712 | 01.06.2012 | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ735964 | 27.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ71793312 | 01.06.2012 | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12018500401 | 18.02.2019 | B1 | PH12018500401 | 18.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2714735T | 21.02.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | EP12792320 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS62457 | 30.11.2021 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | EP12792320 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG195253 | 30.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2714735T | 31.12.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | EP12792320 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201309050 | 27.08.2014 | B | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | WO2012US40545 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012167143 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6877500B | Global Dossier | 26.05.2021 | B2 | JP2020014464 | 30.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6571843B | Global Dossier | 04.09.2019 | B2 | JP2018172412 | 08.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA201990698 | 30.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE056808T | 28.04.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY171135 | 27.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY192843 | 12.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2714735T | 26.10.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201902706V | 29.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161493230 | 03.06.2011 | Type | Earlier application | EP2714735 |