EP3954704 - ANTIBODIES SPECIFIC FOR TGF-BETA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XOMA Technology Ltd. 2200 Powell Street, Suite 310 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEDINGER, Daniel Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | 02 /
KHAN, Shireen, S. Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | 03 /
MIRZA, Amer Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | 04 /
NARASIMHA, Ajay, J. Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | 05 /
TAKEUCHI, Toshihiko Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21186327.9 | 01.06.2012 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US201161493230P | 03.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161493230 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954704 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/22, A61K39/00, A61P35/00 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
C07K16/22 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,IL);
A61P1/04 (EP,IL);
A61P1/06 (EP,IL);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL);
A61P11/00 (EP,IL);
A61P11/08 (EP,IL);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL);
A61P15/00 (EP,IL);
A61P15/08 (EP,IL);
A61P15/10 (EP,IL);
A61P17/00 (EP,IL);
A61P17/02 (EP,IL);
A61P17/04 (EP,IL);
A61P19/00 (EP,IL);
A61P19/02 (EP,IL);
A61P19/04 (EP,IL);
A61P19/08 (EP,IL);
A61P19/10 (EP,IL);
A61P21/00 (EP,IL);
A61P21/02 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/16 (EP,IL);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL);
A61P27/02 (EP,IL);
A61P27/06 (EP,IL);
A61P27/12 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P37/02 (EP,IL);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL);
A61P9/04 (EP,IL);
A61P9/08 (EP,IL);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL);
A61P9/12 (EP,IL);
A61P9/14 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/505 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/30 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/56 (EA,IL,US);
C07K2317/565 (EA,IL,US);
C07K2317/567 (EA,IL,US);
C07K2317/64 (EA,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TGF-BETA-SPEZIFISCHE ANTIKÖRPER | [2022/07] | English: | ANTIBODIES SPECIFIC FOR TGF-BETA | [2022/07] | French: | ANTICORPS SPÉCIFIQUES DU TGF BÊTA | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 15.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12792320.9 / EP2714735 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005276802 (ADAMS CAMELLIA W [US], et al); | [I]US2006251658 (LEDBETTER STEVEN R [US], et al); | [I]US2008292638 (JONES BRYAN EDWARD [US], et al); | by applicant | US30985 | US4179337 | WO8101145 | US4301144 | EP0073657 | US4391904 | US4419446 | US4495285 | US4496689 | US4560655 | EP0183070 | US4601978 | US4609546 | WO8700195 | US4640835 | US4657866 | US4670417 | US4676980 | WO8705330 | EP0244234 | US4766106 | US4767704 | WO8807378 | US4791192 | US4816567 | DD266710 | EP0315456 | WO9003430 | US4927762 | US4965199 | WO9013646 | US4975278 | EP0402226 | EP0404097 | WO9100906 | WO9104748 | US5057313 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9209690 | US5122469 | WO9215679 | WO9218619 | WO9220791 | WO9301288 | WO9310808 | WO9311161 | WO9312366 | US5223409 | US5229275 | WO9319172 | WO9402602 | WO9411026 | US5348867 | WO9515388 | WO9611953 | US5545807 | WO9627011 | WO9630498 | US5565332 | WO9632478 | US5567610 | WO9633735 | WO9634096 | US5571714 | US5573905 | US5589369 | US5591669 | US5624821 | US5643768 | US5658754 | WO9734631 | US5723287 | WO9824893 | US5766886 | US5770429 | US5772998 | US5783185 | US5877293 | WO9910494 | US5939598 | US5969108 | WO9958572 | US6054287 | WO0040227 | US6090383 | US6091001 | US6114598 | US6194551 | WO0124813 | US6306393 | US2002004215 | US6419928 | WO02092780 | US6489145 | US6492497 | US2002199213 | US2003028071 | US2003031667 | US2003032995 | US2003044772 | US2003092125 | WO03041600 | US2003118592 | US2003133939 | US6605449 | US2003190317 | US2003194404 | US6657103 | US6664114 | EP1391213 | US6699658 | US6737056 | US2004132101 | US6833268 | US2005037421 | US2005136049 | US7151169 | US7369111 | US7494651 | US7527791 | WO2009088933 | WO2009088928 | WO2009088924 | US7579186 | US7723486 | US7867496 | US7927593 |