EP3967850 - TURBOMACHINE WITH AIR FLOW MEASUREMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University 300 Turner Street NW Blacksburg, VA 24061 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kyritsis, Vasileios Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Lowe, Kevin Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | 03 /
Bristow, Maurice Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | 04 /
Loftus, Peter Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 21190488.3 | 10.08.2021 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | US202017017082 | 10.09.2020 Original published format: US202017017082 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967850 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3967850 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/08, F01D21/00, G01F1/66, G01P5/24 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
F01D17/08 (EP);
F01D21/003 (EP,CN);
G01M15/14 (US);
F01D25/00 (CN);
F02C9/00 (CN);
G01F1/667 (EP);
G01N29/14 (US);
F05D2210/30 (EP);
F05D2260/80 (EP);
F05D2270/3061 (EP);
F05D2270/80 (EP);
F05D2270/806 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TURBOMASCHINE MIT LUFTSTRÖMUNGSMESSSYSTEM | [2022/11] | English: | TURBOMACHINE WITH AIR FLOW MEASUREMENT SYSTEM | [2022/11] | French: | TURBOMACHINE AVEC SYSTÉME DE MESURE D'ÉCOULEMENT D'AIR | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/11] | TURBOMACHINE AVEC SYSTÈME DE MESURE D'ÉCOULEMENT D'AIR | Examination procedure | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 16.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5478199 (GLIEBE PHILIP R [US]) [Y] 5,10 * column 6, lines 25-31; figure 1 * * column 7, lines 29-31 *; | [A]US2012150413 (BUNCE RICHARD H [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0005] , [0 22] , [0 38]; figures 2, 3, 4, 6, 7 *; | [Y]EP2738372 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0046] , [0054] , [0055]; figures 2a,2b,3,4 *; | [XYI]US2015260557 (DESILVA UPUL P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 66] , [0 76] , [0100] , [ 102]; figures 3,9 * [Y] 5,7,10 [I] 12,13; | [X]US2017176265 (DESILVA UPUL P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0073] , [0100] , [0115] , [0140]; figures 9,12,13,18 *; | [A]EP3543646 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0022] , [0049] , [0050] , [0071]; figures 1, 2, 12, 17, 18 * | by applicant | EP3255438 |