Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
27.10.2023 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.03.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
03.05.2022 | Change - representative | |
01.10.2021 | Change - representative |