Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4409179 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP74953 | 08.09.2022 | EP21200070 | 30.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117957393 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP74953 | 08.09.2022 | EP21200070 | 30.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022357175 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP74953 | 08.09.2022 | EP21200070 | 30.09.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023052074 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21200070 | 30.09.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4160067 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21200070 | 30.09.2021 |