EP4160067 - A VALVE HANDWHEEL AND A VALVE ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING SUCH A VALVE HANDWHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMI Hydronic Engineering International SA Lake Geneva Business Park Route de Crassier 19 1262 Eysins / CH | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSTORP, Leif 523 97 Ulricehamn / SE | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21200070.7 | 30.09.2021 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160067 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/60, F16K37/00 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
F16K31/607 (EP);
F16K31/60 (EP);
F16K31/602 (EP);
F16K37/0058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILHANDRAD UND VENTILANORDNUNG MIT SOLCH EINEM VENTILHANDRAD | [2023/14] | English: | A VALVE HANDWHEEL AND A VALVE ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING SUCH A VALVE HANDWHEEL | [2023/14] | French: | ROBINET À VOLANT MANUEL ET AGENCEMENT DE SOUPAPE COMPRENANT UN TEL ROBINET À VOLANT MANUEL | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/11] | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9003195U ; | [XAYI]EP1900986 (PERGOLA S R L [IT]); | [YD]WO2008043362 (DANFOSS AS [DK], et al) | by applicant | WO2008043362 |