EP3975338 - LOW COMMON MODE RESONANCE MULTIBAND RADIATING ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outdoor Wireless Networks LLC 3642 E. US Highway 70 Claremont North Carolina 28610 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2024/36] | For all designated states Outdoor Wireless Networks LLC 3642 E. US Highway 70 Claremont North Carolina 28610 / US | ||
Former [2024/21] | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 3642 E US Highway 70 Claremont, NC 28610 / US | ||
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHOOSHTARI, Alireza Plano, Texas, 75025 / US | 02 /
ZIMMERMAN, Martin L. Chicago, Illinois, 60614 / US | 03 /
BISIULES, Peter J. Lagrange Park, Illinois, 60526 / US | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Würmser, Julian Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21202123.2 | 28.05.2015 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | US201562103799P | 15.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562103799 P | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975338 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/52, H01Q21/06, // H01Q1/24, H01Q1/38, H01Q21/26 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H01Q1/521 (EP,US);
H01Q9/285 (US);
H01Q1/50 (US);
H01Q21/062 (EP,US);
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q21/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRBANDIGE STRAHLENDE GRUPPENANTENNE MIT NIEDRIGER GLEICHTAKTRESONANZ | [2022/13] | English: | LOW COMMON MODE RESONANCE MULTIBAND RADIATING ARRAY | [2022/13] | French: | RÉSEAU RAYONNANT MULTIBANDE À FAIBLE RÉSONANCE EN MODE COMMUN | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 25.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15727274.1 / EP3245691 | EP20188138.0 / EP3748772 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009030041 (SIERRA WIRELESS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 25, lines 12-31 *; | [A]US2010271280 (PICKLES WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraphs [0047] , [0048] , [0074] - [0083] *; | [A]EP2736117 (ANDREW LLC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0044] * | by applicant | US19910619877 | WO2012CN87300 |