EP3964834 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING A COOLING AND LUBRICATING EMULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blaser Swisslube AG Winterseistrasse 3415 Hasle-Rüegsau / CH | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katzenmeier, Heinz 3432 Lützelflüh / CH | 02 /
Schneeberger, Manfred 3110 Münsingen / CH | [2023/24] |
Former [2022/10] | 01 /
Katzenmeier, Heinz 3432 Lützelflüh-Goldbach / CH | ||
02 /
Schneeberger, Manfred 3506 Grosshöchstetten / CH | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 21204394.7 | 03.12.2019 | [2022/10] | Priority number, date | EP20180213572 | 18.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18213572 | [2022/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3964834 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3964834 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/28 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G01N33/2894 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER KÜHL-SCHMIERSTOFFEMULSION | [2022/10] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING A COOLING AND LUBRICATING EMULSION | [2022/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SUPERVISION D'UNE ÉMULSION DE LUBRIFIANT ET REFROIDISSEMENT | [2022/10] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 09.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19813812.5 / EP3899529 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4315421 (WILSON WALTER A) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 26 - column 8, line 48; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH08233804 (YUSHIRO CHEM IND) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1365236 (THOMA ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0054]; figure 6 *; | [A]US2004159145 (SEEVERS STANLEY W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0038]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2007202603 (COUNTS STEVEN WAYNE [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0041]; figure 3 *; | [AD]GB2547056 (JEMTECH (UK) LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | US5389546 | GB2547056 |