Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12043362 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2024 | B2 | US2023182882 | 15.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21214224 | 14.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230090252 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21214224 | 14.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7482576B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2024 | B2 | JP2023088268 | 26.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21214224 | 14.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116262540 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21214224 | 14.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4197898 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2024 | B1 | EP4197898 | 21.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21214224 | 14.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI4197898T | 02.07.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP21214224 | 14.12.2021 |