EP4197898 - DRAINING ARRANGEMENT OF A PROPULSION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laine, Jukka 03100 Nummela / FI | 02 /
Willgren, Sven 00980 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
Niska, Toni 01700 Vantaa / FI | [2023/52] |
Former [2023/25] | 01 /
Laine, Jukka 00980 Helsinki / FI | ||
02 /
Willgren, Sven 00980 Helsinki / FI | |||
03 /
Niska, Toni 01700 Vantaa / FI | Representative(s) | Boco IP Oy Ab Kansakoulukatu 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21214224.4 | 14.12.2021 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4197898 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4197898 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B63H20/00, // B63H5/07 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
B63H20/001 (EP,US);
B63B13/00 (KR,US);
B63H21/38 (CN,US);
G05D16/2013 (KR,US);
B63H2005/075 (EP,US);
B63H2005/1254 (KR,US);
B63H5/125 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | ENTWÄSSERUNGSANORDNUNG EINER ANTRIEBSEINHEIT | [2023/25] | English: | DRAINING ARRANGEMENT OF A PROPULSION UNIT | [2023/25] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE DRAINAGE D'UNE UNITÉ DE PROPULSION | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2021 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 17.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1213221 (KOBELCO MARINE ENGINEERING CO [JP]); | [A]JP2002234493 (COBELCO MARINE ENGINEERING KK) |