EP4201172 - AGRICULTURAL PLOUGH AND METHOD FOR OPERATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Industrial Sweden AB Bruksgatan 4 590 96 Överum / SE | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hertzog, Daniel 59376 Blackstad / SE | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Raasch, Detlef Heuking Kühn Lüer Wojtek Partnerschaft mit beschränkter Berufshaftung von Rechtsanwälten und Steuerberatern Georg-Glock-Straße 4 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | CNH Industrial IP Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 21217276.1 | 23.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4201172 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01B63/14, // A01B3/46, A01B63/00, A01B63/22, A01B79/02 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
A01B63/14 (EP);
A01B3/464 (EP);
A01B63/004 (EP);
A01B63/008 (EP);
A01B63/22 (EP);
A01B79/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHER PFLUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB | [2023/26] | English: | AGRICULTURAL PLOUGH AND METHOD FOR OPERATING | [2023/26] | French: | CHARRUE AGRICOLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 02.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1143784 (UNIV TOKYO AGRICULTURE & TECHNOLOGY TLO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 58-59, 103,120,138 *; | [IA]EP3837936 (CNH IND SWEDEN AB [SE]) [I] 1-3,8-15 * paragraph [0073]; figures 2, 5 * [A] 4-7; | [A] - BINBIN XIE ET AL, "Research progress on Autonomous Navigation Technology of Agricultural Robot", 2021 IEEE 11TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CYBER TECHNOLOGY IN AUTOMATION, CONTROL, AND INTELLIGENT SYSTEMS (CYBER), IEEE, (20210727), doi:10.1109/CYBER53097.2021.9588152, pages 891 - 898, XP034013682 [A] 1-15 * figures 3, 9a2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CYBER53097.2021.9588152 |