Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4111084 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2024 | B1 | EP4111084 | 04.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020104733 | 24.02.2020 | WO2021EP53457 | 12.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021170423 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020104733 | 24.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102020104733 | 26.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020104733 | 24.02.2020 |