EP4111084 - DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A LIQUID HOSE TO A VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grohe AG 58675 Hemer / DE | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAINKA, David Dahlbreite 20 58640 Iserlohn / DE | 02 /
SCHLÜTER, Matthias Lichtendorfer Straße 141 44289 Dortmund NRW / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21705175.4 | 12.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021EP53457 | Priority number, date | DE202010104733 | 24.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020104733 | [2023/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021170423 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111084 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4111084 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/14, E03C1/02, F16L33/22, F16L33/28 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
F16L37/144 (EP);
F16L33/22 (EP);
F16L33/28 (EP);
E03C1/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBINDUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSSCHLAUCHS AN EINEM VENTIL | [2023/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A LIQUID HOSE TO A VALVE | [2023/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT D'UN TUYAU À LIQUIDE À UNE VANNE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 17.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3729570 (SCHAEFER JOHANNES [DE]); | [XAY]DE3733027 (GULLICK DOBSON LTD [GB]); | [Y]EP0745800 (GROHE KG HANS [DE]); | [Y]EP3199856 (KRAUSSER ANTJE [DE]) |