EP4097106 - 1H-PYRAZOLO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS AS TOLL-LIKE RECEPTOR 7 (TLR7) AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.08.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POUDEL, Yam B. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 700 Bay Road Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 02 /
COX, Matthew c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 700 Bay Road Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 03 /
HE, Liqi 152 Sprucemont Place San Jose, California 95139 / US | 04 /
GAVAI, Ashvinikumar V. 12 Stonewall Drive Princeton Junction, New Jersey 08550 / US | 05 /
GANGWAR, Sanjeev 312 Pompano Cir Foster City, California 94404 / US | 06 /
BROEKEMA, Matthias 209 Riverwoods Drive New Hope, Pennsylvania 18938 / US | 07 /
TARBY, Christine M. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 08 /
SUBBAIAH, Murugaiah Andappan Murugaiah c/o Syngene International Ltd Biocon Special Economic Zone Biocon Park, Plot Nos. 2&3 Bommasandra Industrial Area, V Phase, Jigani Link Road Bommasandra, Karnataka Bangalore 560 099 / IN | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21706115.9 | 26.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021US14982 | Priority number, date | US202062966119P | 27.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062966119 P | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021154668 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4097106 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61P35/00, A61K31/519 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (KR,US);
A61K31/5386 (US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | 1H-PYRAZOLO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDINVERBINDUNGEN ALS TOLL-LIKE REZEPTOR 7 (TLR7)-AGONISTEN | [2022/49] | English: | 1H-PYRAZOLO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS AS TOLL-LIKE RECEPTOR 7 (TLR7) AGONISTS | [2022/49] | French: | COMPOSÉS 1H-PYRAZOLO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDINE UTILES EN TANT QU'AGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR DE TYPE TOLL 7 (TLR7) | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 19.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP3546457 (JIANGSU HENGRUI MEDICINE CO [CN], et al); | [XPI]WO2020028608 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) | by applicant | US6028076 | US6376501 | JP2004137157 | WO2007028129 | US7241890 | US2007225303 | US7521454 | US2009105212 | US2009118263 | US7642350 | US7691877 | US2011028715 | US7919498 | US2012003298 | US8148371 | US2012083473 | US2012231023 | US2012302598 | US2013202629 | US8729088 | US2014141033 | US2014323441 | WO2015036044 | US8993755 | US9050376 | US9127006 | US9161934 | US2015299221 | US9173935 | US9295732 | US2016168150 | WO2016107536 | US2016199499 | US2016304531 | US9499549 | US2017121421 | WO2017076346 | US9662336 | US2017273983 | WO2017216293 | US9902730 | US9944649 | WO2018095426 | WO2019124500 | US10457681 | WO2019209811 | US10472361 | US10487084 | US10494370 | US10508115 | US2020038403 | US2020039986 | US2020083403 |