Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4117945
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
22.03.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
19.03.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
19.03.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.02.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.05.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
12.05.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
24.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
16.12.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
16.12.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
23.11.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.11.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
05.09.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.03.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
17.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
08.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|