EP4117945 - BODYSHELL STRUCTURE FOR AN ELECTRICALLY POWERED CAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mercedes-Benz Group AG Mercedesstraße 120 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALKE, Clemens Seewiesenweg 41 73734 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
HÄFNER, Thorsten Steinmauerstraße 7 72622 Nürtingen / DE | 03 /
TALKE, Anja Jesinger Str. 12-1 73230 Kirchheim Teck / DE | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2024/17] |
Former [2023/03] | Thoms, Frank Daimler Brand & IP Management GmbH & Co. KG 063 - H512 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 21708183.5 | 24.02.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021EP54479 | Priority number, date | DE20201001540 | 09.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020001540 | [2023/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021180469 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4117945 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4117945 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/04, B62D25/20, H01M10/613 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
B01D45/08 (US);
B01D46/2411 (US);
B01D47/06 (US);
B60L58/26 (US);
B62D25/20 (EP,US);
H01M50/204 (EP);
H01M50/249 (EP);
H01M50/358 (EP,US);
B60K13/06 (EP);
B60K2001/005 (EP,US);
B60K2001/0438 (EP,US);
B60Y2306/05 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHBAUSTRUKTUR FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCH ANTREIBBAREN KRAFTWAGEN | [2023/03] | English: | BODYSHELL STRUCTURE FOR AN ELECTRICALLY POWERED CAR | [2023/03] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CARROSSERIE POUR UNE VOITURE À ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 05.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012237803 (MARDALL JOSEPH [US], et al); | [AD]EP2704915 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [A]DE102017000266 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [A]WO2020013120 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) | by applicant | EP2704915 |