EP4094288 - ELECTRONICS MODULE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRONICS MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rogers Germany GmbH Am Stadtwald 2 92676 Eschenbach / DE | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Andreas Hopfengarten 20 95469 Speichersdorf / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Karsten Tachauer Str. 12 92676 Eschenbach / DE | 03 /
WELKER, Tilo Krottenseer Weg 14 91284 Neuhaus / DE | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21712423.9 | 08.03.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021EP55760 | Priority number, date | DE202010106521 | 10.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020106521 | [2022/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021180639 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094288 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/373, H01L23/538, H01L23/498, H05K1/02 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
H05K1/0203 (EP);
H01L25/072 (EP,KR);
H05K1/181 (KR,US);
H01L21/4846 (KR);
H01L21/4882 (KR);
H01L23/3735 (EP,KR);
H01L23/3736 (KR);
H01L23/49833 (EP);
H01L23/49838 (KR);
H01L23/49894 (KR);
H01L23/5385 (EP);
H01L24/47 (KR);
H01L25/50 (EP,KR);
H05K1/0209 (KR);
H05K1/0306 (US);
H05K1/053 (EP);
H05K1/111 (KR);
H05K1/183 (US);
H05K3/429 (US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L2224/83101 (EP);
H01L25/18 (EP);
H05K1/115 (EP);
H05K2201/066 (EP);
H05K2201/09036 (US);
H05K2201/09545 (US);
H05K2201/09745 (EP);
H05K2201/10666 (US);
H05K2203/049 (US);
H05K3/0029 (EP);
H05K3/0061 (EP);
H05K3/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONIKMODUL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTRONIKMODULS | [2022/48] | English: | ELECTRONICS MODULE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRONICS MODULE | [2022/48] | French: | MODULE ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MODULE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 24.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003086747 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]US2009039498 (BAYERER REINHOLD [DE]); | [A]EP2432014 (ROHM CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]DE102011101052 (HERAEUS MATERIALS TECH GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE102013210146 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]); | [Y]US2016056132 (BAYERER REINHOLD [DE], et al) | by applicant | US3744120 | DE2319854 | DE19927046 | DE102009033029 | DE102013104739 |