EP4125502 - CLOTHES HANGERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Initiate GRP Ltd Studio 25, 101 Clerkenwell Road London EC1R 5BX / GB | For all designated states Mackenzie, Norman Fraser 613 Manchester Road Isle of Dogs, London E14 3NU / GB | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACKENZIE, Norman Fraser 613 Manchester Road Isle of Dogs, London E14 3NU / GB | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Sach, Greg Robert Valet Patent Services Limited c/o Caya 83713X Am Börstig 5 96052 Bamberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Sach, Greg Robert Valet Patent Services Limited Siedlungsstr. 4a 85253 Erdweg / DE | Application number, filing date | 21716304.7 | 26.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP58044 | Priority number, date | GB20200004423 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: GB 202004423 | GB20200018632 | 26.11.2020 Original published format: GB 202018632 | GB20210003308 | 10.03.2021 Original published format: GB 202103308 | GB20210003554 | 15.03.2021 Original published format: GB 202103554 | GB20210003624 | 16.03.2021 Original published format: GB 202103624 | GB20210003962 | 22.03.2021 Original published format: GB 202103962 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021191458 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4125502 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47G25/20, A47G25/30, A47G25/36, A47G25/38, A47G25/14, A47G25/48 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
A47G25/20 (EP);
A47G25/1428 (EP);
A47G25/30 (EP);
A47G25/36 (EP);
A47G25/38 (EP);
A47G25/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | KLEIDERBÜGEL | [2023/06] | English: | CLOTHES HANGERS | [2023/06] | French: | CINTRE POUR VÊTEMENT | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 25.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2023 | 31.03.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6644521 (TISS IRVING [US], et al) [X] 16 * column 5, lines 15-17 - column 6, lines 1-5; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]JP2006149968 (SANWA KK) [X] 16 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 17; | [A]EP2000058 (GREENHANGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XI]KR20130107074 (BANG YUN BAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,12,14,15 * figures 1-11 * [I] 6,10,11; | [Y]WO2015015139 (MACKENZIE NORMAN FRASER [GB]) [Y] 17 * figures 8,9 *; | [X]KR20150000707U (-) [X] 1,2,7,8,13-15 * figures 1-5 *; | [XI]EP3484330 (MACKENZIE NORMAN FRASER [GB]) [X] 16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0134] - [0138] - [0144] , [0145]; claims 1-8,21 * [I] 17 |