Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024254978 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063002674 | 31.03.2020 | US202117313663 | 06.05.2021 | US202418622187 | 29.03.2024 | US202117526329 | 15.11.2021 | US202318133840 | 12.04.2023 | WO2021US25121 | 31.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12092090 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2024 | B2 | US2023243347 | 03.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063002674 | 31.03.2020 | US202117313663 | 06.05.2021 | US202117526329 | 15.11.2021 | US202318133840 | 12.04.2023 | WO2021US25121 | 31.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11655810 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2023 | B2 | US2022074402 | 10.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063002674 | 31.03.2020 | US202117313663 | 06.05.2021 | US202117526329 | 15.11.2021 | WO2021US25121 | 31.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11434892 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2022 | B2 | US2021301808 | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063002674 | 31.03.2020 | US202117313594 | 06.05.2021 | WO2021US25121 | 31.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11174854 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2021 | B2 | US2021301809 | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063002674 | 31.03.2020 | US202117313663 | 06.05.2021 | WO2021US25121 | 31.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220156622 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202063002674 | 31.03.2020 | WO2021US25121 | 31.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115362316 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202063002674 | 31.03.2020 | WO2021US25121 | 31.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021246059 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063002674 | 31.03.2020 | WO2021US25121 | 31.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4127471 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063002674 | 31.03.2020 | WO2021US25121 | 31.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021202689 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063002674 | 31.03.2020 |