EP4127471 - ELECTRICALLY OPERATED DISPLACEMENT PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graco Minnesota Inc. 88 11th Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55413-1829 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINES, Bradley, H. 15546 Bluebird Street NW Andover, Minnesota 55304 / US | 02 /
SCHEIERL, Paul, W. 11461 250th St. Chisago City, Minnesota 55013 / US | 03 /
KOEHN, Brian, W. 652 Adams St. NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55413 / US | 04 /
HIGGINS, Jacob, D. 5470 Township Dr. White Bear Township, Minnesota 55110 / US | 05 /
PAAR, Benjamin, J. 3941 Ewing Avenue S. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55410 / US | 06 /
FEHR, David, L. 13405 Pineview Ct. Dayton, Minnesota 55327 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 21720635.8 | 31.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US25121 | Priority number, date | US202063002674P | 31.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063002674 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021202689 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4127471 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F04B9/02, F04B1/02, F04B43/02, F04B49/06, F04B53/08, F04B53/18, F04B17/03 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
F04B43/04 (EP,KR,US);
F04B17/03 (EP,US);
F04B1/02 (EP);
F04B43/026 (EP);
F04B49/065 (EP,KR,US);
F04B49/20 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENE VERDRÄNGERPUMPE | [2023/06] | English: | ELECTRICALLY OPERATED DISPLACEMENT PUMP | [2023/06] | French: | POMPE À DÉPLACEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 20.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9012962 (ARO CORP [US]); | [XY]DE4300512 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0799672 (WESTERN ATLAS INT INC [US]); | [Y]WO2010066754 (GJERDRUM AS ING [NO], et al); | [A]US2015226192 (HINES BRADLEY H [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2015127497 (TECHNI WATERJET PTY LTD [AU]) |