EP4143364 - COMPONENT WITH A WEAR PROTECTION COATING, AND METHOD FOR COATING SAID COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANDL, Bernhard 4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
GROISS, Heiko 4213 Unterweitersdorf / AT | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21722156.3 | 23.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021EP60681 | Priority number, date | DE202010205537 | 30.04.2020 Original published format: DE102020205537 | [2023/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219511 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143364 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/00, C23C14/02, C23C14/06, C23C14/16, C23C30/00, F02M61/16 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
C23C28/32 (EP);
C23C14/025 (EP);
C23C14/0605 (EP);
C23C14/0641 (EP);
C23C14/16 (EP);
C23C28/322 (EP);
C23C28/34 (EP);
C23C28/343 (EP);
C23C28/347 (EP);
C23C30/005 (EP);
F02M59/445 (EP);
F02M61/166 (EP);
F02M61/18 (EP);
F02M2200/9038 (EP);
F02M2200/9046 (EP);
F02M59/102 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | VERSCHLEIßSCHUTZBESCHICHTETES BAUTEIL SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN DESSELBEN | [2023/10] | English: | COMPONENT WITH A WEAR PROTECTION COATING, AND METHOD FOR COATING SAID COMPONENT | [2023/10] | French: | COMPOSANT DOTÉ D'UN REVÊTEMENT DE PROTECTION CONTRE L'USURE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT DUDIT COMPOSANT | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 30.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 11.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE10038954 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] * * claims 1-19 *[A] 1-8; | [XAI]US2014199561 (ZHANG CHUN-JIE [CN], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0037] * * claims 1-13 * * figure 1 * [A] 9 [I] 7,8; | [XYI]CN104120395 (UNIV GUILIN ELECTRONIC TECH) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0013] * * claims 1-6 * [Y] 9 [I] 7,8; | [XAI]CN106065460B (YUANXING (XIAMEN) PREC TOOL CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * claims 1-5 * [A] 9 [I] 8 | by applicant | DE102009003192 |