EP4106474 - SIDELINK TRANSMISSION CONTROL METHOD, SENDING TERMINAL AND RECEIVING TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JI, Zichao No.168 Jinghai East Rd. Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 02 /
PENG, Shuyan No.168 Jinghai East Rd. Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21754261.2 | 08.02.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021CN76039 | Priority number, date | CN20201095210 | 14.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010095210 | [2022/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021160093 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4106474 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04L1/16, H04L1/00, H04W72/541 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
H04W72/541 (EP);
H04W72/02 (EP,KR);
H04W74/0858 (CN,KR);
H04W28/26 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP);
H04L1/0009 (EP);
H04L1/0025 (EP);
H04L1/1607 (CN,KR);
H04L1/1893 (EP);
H04W24/08 (KR);
H04W4/06 (KR);
H04W72/20 (EP,KR);
H04W72/51 (KR);
H04W72/54 (KR);
H04W76/28 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/51] | H04W74/08, H04L1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | SIDELINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGS-STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, SENDENDES ENDGERÄT UND EMPFANGENDES ENDGERÄT | [2022/51] | English: | SIDELINK TRANSMISSION CONTROL METHOD, SENDING TERMINAL AND RECEIVING TERMINAL | [2022/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION DE LIAISON LATÉRALE, TERMINAL D'ENVOI ET TERMINAL DE RÉCEPTION | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2022 | Translation filed | 06.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 28.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN108810906 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [X]EP3499747 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | International search | [X]CN106792885 (BEIJING SPREADTRUM HIGH-TECH COMMUNICATIONS TECH CO LTD); | [X]WO2018021803 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]CN107682930 (DATANG TELECOM TECH & INDUSTRY HOLDING CO LTD); | [X]CN108810906 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [X]CN109644458 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD); | [A]US2019289615 (LEE YOUNGDAE [KR], et al) |