EP4211379 - PIPE FEEDTHROUGH THROUGH A CONSTRUCTION SEPARATING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trautner, Stefan Oberort 42 4162 Julbach / AT | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/29] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 21772662.9 | 06.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021AT60314 | Priority number, date | AT20200050759 | 08.09.2020 Original published format: AT 507592020 | [2023/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022051789 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4211379 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16L5/00, E04G15/06, F16L5/10, F16L5/02, F16L5/14, E04B1/66 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
E04G15/061 (EP,AT);
F16L5/02 (EP,AT);
E03C1/22 (AT);
E04D13/0409 (AT);
F16L5/14 (EP);
E04B1/665 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | ROHRDURCHFÜHRUNG DURCH EIN BAUWERKS-TRENNELEMENT | [2023/29] | English: | PIPE FEEDTHROUGH THROUGH A CONSTRUCTION SEPARATING ELEMENT | [2023/29] | French: | TRAVERSÉE DE TUYAU À TRAVERS UN ÉLÉMENT DE SÉPARATION DE CONSTRUCTION | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 14.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE3231932 (ESSMANN KG HEINZ [DE]); | [A]DE4427603 (HEINKER NORBERT [DE], et al); | [XA]DE102005030470 (HAUFF TECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [AD]EP2273170 (SPADIN BRUNO [CH]) | by applicant | CH522091 | EP1462706 | EP2273170 | EP3361132 |