EP4126258 - DUAL MODE PROTECTIVE FACE MASK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OP-D-OP, Inc. 10628 Industrial Avenue Roseville, California 95678 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDIS, Timothy OP-D-OP, INC. 10628 Industrial Avenue Roseville, California 95678 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Lusinchi, Laurent Pierre Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21781447.4 | 26.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US24324 | Priority number, date | US202063001369P | 29.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063001369 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021202272 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4126258 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A62B23/02, A62B18/02, A41D13/11 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
A41D13/1176 (EP);
A62B23/025 (EP,US);
A41D13/1169 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | GESICHTSSCHUTZMASKE MIT ZWEI BETRIEBSARTEN | [2023/06] | English: | DUAL MODE PROTECTIVE FACE MASK | [2023/06] | French: | MASQUE FACIAL DE PROTECTION À DOUBLE MODE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 02.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6308330 (HOLLANDER DAVID [US], et al); | [XI]US2004231023 (HUANG CHE HSING [TW]); | [XI]US2011061656 (MATICH RONALD D [US]) | International search | [X]KR20040049301 (LEE SEUNG YUL) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001], [0011]-[0017], claim 1, and figures 1, 2 *; | [A]WO2004080219 (MATICH RONALD D [US]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-28 and figures 1A-8B *; | [A]US2008110469 (WEINBERG STANLEY [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0052]-[0065] and figures 6-9 *; | [A]KR20140128666 (YANG MIN WOO [KR]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0029]-[0057] and figures 4-14 *; | [A]CN106572713 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO) [A] 1-9* claims 1-16 and figures 1-6 * |