Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021299488 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063001369 | 29.03.2020 | US202117213737 | 26.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4126258 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2024 | A4 | EP4126258 | 08.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063001369 | 29.03.2020 | WO2021US24324 | 26.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021202272 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063001369 | 29.03.2020 |