Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024009639 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020128118 | 26.10.2020 | WO2021EP78131 | 12.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230093500 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102020128118 | 26.10.2020 | WO2021EP78131 | 12.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117177807 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102020128118 | 26.10.2020 | WO2021EP78131 | 12.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4232187 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020128118 | 26.10.2020 | WO2021EP78131 | 12.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023004605 | 08.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102020128118 | 26.10.2020 | WO2021EP78131 | 12.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022089932 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020128118 | 26.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102020128118 | 28.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020128118 | 26.10.2020 |